Sharaf, Mahmoud Adel (CPSO#: 80524)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Mar 2004 to 31 Mar 2004
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 28 Jul 2004
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2008