Sharan, Sumit (CPSO#: 77724)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Department of Anaesthesiology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

435 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3C5K6
Canada
Phone: 7056752100
Fax: 7052228119
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sumit Sharan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharan ( CPSO# 77724 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Anaesthesiology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
435 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K6
Phone Number: (705) 675-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUMIT SHARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008