Sharda, Rajeshvar Kumar (CPSO#: 84621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
1 Young St
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone: (905) 527-5559
Fax: (905) 527-3883
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lasik MD
270 North Service Rd W c3
Oakville ON  L6M 2R8
Canada
Phone: 905-845-4740
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Lasik MD
276 Mud St W
Hamilton ON  L8J 3Z6
Canada
Phone: 9055781115
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sharda ( CPSO# 84621 )

Business Address:
206 John Street
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 774-7431

Business Address:
270 North Service Road West
C3
Oakville ON  L6M 2R8
Phone Number: (905) 845-4740

Business Address:
276 Mud Street West
Hamilton ON  L8J 3Z6
Phone Number: (905) 578-1115

Business Address:
Suite 302
1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 527-5559

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJESHVAR KUMAR SHARDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011