Sharda, Saroo (CPSO#: 86852)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: Sharma, Saroo (used until: 29 Apr 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Leicester, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Anesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 44890
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: 905-845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

1245 Lakeshore Rd.
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Canada
Phone: 905-632-3737
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saroo Sharda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharda ( CPSO# 86852 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Business Address:
J Brantford Hospital
1230 N Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
206 John Street
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 774-7431

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAROO SHARDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2012