Sharifi, Shannon Elizabeth (CPSO#: 86369)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 8G5
Phone: 7054748600
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shannon Sharifi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharifi ( CPSO# 86369 )

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
PO Box 2500
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANNON ELIZABETH SHARIFI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARIFI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 07 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2012