Sharma, Ajay Parkash (CPSO#: 78674)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 24 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Punjabi University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nephrology
Department of Paediatrics
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8379
Fax: (519) 685-8156
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ajay Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sharma ( CPSO# 90246 )
Dr. A. Sharma ( CPSO# 78674 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
Department of Paediatrics
Room B1-170
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8379

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 23 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AJAY PARKASH SHARMA may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO in which Dr. SHARMA holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. SHARMA may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. SHARMA no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. SHARMA no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. SHARMA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2002 to 31 Jan 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Aug 2003 to 14 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Aug 2004 to 12 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2010