Sharma, Anjali (CPSO#: 89748)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Santosh Medical College, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd.
Cambridge ON  N1R3G2
Phone: (519) 6212330 Ext. 5218
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anjali Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sharma ( CPSO# 89748 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 740-4900

Business Address:
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANJALI SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014