Sharma, Kalpana Singh (CPSO#: 87389)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
701 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 309
North York, Ontario
M2K 2Z3
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 901-7701
Fax: (416) 901-7706
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4001 Leslie Street
North York, ON
M2K 1E1
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kalpana Singh Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sharma ( CPSO# 87389 )

Business Address:
309 - 701 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2Z3
Phone Number: (416) 901-7701

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KALPANA SINGH SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012