Sharma, Madhu (CPSO#: 61162)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tufts University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Elective Trainee - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 24 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 28 Dec 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006