Sharma, Manas (CPSO#: 90146)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Apr 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Nepali, Other

Education:Gauhati University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3203
Fax: (519) 663-8803
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lee Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 20 2017


Corporation Name: Manas Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sharma ( CPSO# 90146 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Division of Neuroradiology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3203

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Apr 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 13 Feb 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 14 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Mar 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Manas Sharma may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. Sharma holds
                        an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Sharma  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Sharma's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Sharma's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on April 1, 2013, and expires on June 30,
                  2019.  Upon renewal of Dr. Sharma's academic appointment at the
                  University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject
                  to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.