Sharma, Manisha (CPSO#: 92178)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Lucknow, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-4984
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANISHA SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 20 Oct 2009 to 11 Jan 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 12 Jan 2010 to 19 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 20 Oct 2010 to 19 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2011