Sharma, Meena Piyush (CPSO#: 78126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Health Services
300
100, Marie Curie
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meena Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sharma ( CPSO# 78126 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa
Health Services
Unit 300
100 Marie Curie
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEENA PIYUSH SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004