Sharma, Monika (CPSO#: 90246)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Punjab University India, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
whitehills medical centre
1055 fanshawe park road west
london , ontario
n6g0w7
London ON  N6G 2V9
Phone: 519 4720040
Fax: 519 472 7732
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ajay Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sharma ( CPSO# 78674 )
Dr. M. Sharma ( CPSO# 90246 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
Department of Paediatrics
Room B1-170
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8379

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Mar 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONIKA SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2009 to 24 May 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 May 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2011