Sharma, Neha (CPSO#: 91388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Leicester, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
604 Santa Maria Blvd
Building C, Unit 1
Milton
Ontario
Milton ON  L9T 9L7
Phone: (905) 878-0055
Fax: (905) 878-0544
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pediatric Asthma Outpatient Clinic
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville
Ontario
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905)-338-4691
Fax: 905-338-4631
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Pediatric Asthma Outpatient Clinic
Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Canada
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Fax: 905-338-4631
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Humber River Hospital
Pediatric Outpatient Clinic
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242 1000
Fax: (416) 747-3096
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neha Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sharma ( CPSO# 91388 )

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 249-8111

Business Address:
Suite 101
450 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 8T2
Phone Number: (905) 878-9720

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 23 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEHA SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2013