Sharma, Pratibhasri Adipudi (CPSO#: 89580)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Nov 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Nov 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:Univ of Med & Dentistry of New Jersey, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook & Women's College Hosp
Fertility Centre & CREATE IVF Prgrm
Suite 1100
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 323-7727 Ext. 2339
Fax: (416) 323-7334
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pratibhasri Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sharma ( CPSO# 89580 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook & Women's Hospital
Create Fertility Centre
Suite 1100
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 323-7727

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 25 Nov 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Feb 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Pratibhasri   Adipudi  Sharma  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            obstetrics and gynaecology,  limited to gynaecologic reproductive endocrinology
            and fertility, only.