Sharma, Priya (CPSO#: 91107)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Alberta, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sakura Medical Centre
215 Delta Park Blvd
Unit #8
Brampton ON  L6T 0H9
Phone: 905-799-2222
Fax: 905-799-2444
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Priya Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sharma ( CPSO# 91107 )

Business Address:
215 Delta Park Boulevard
Suite 8
Brampton ON  L6T 0H9
Phone Number: (905) 799-2222

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRIYA SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014