Sharma, Sangita (CPSO#: 75188)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Charlton Ave
Hamilton Ontario
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1230 Northshore Blvd
Burlington Ontario
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
Phone: (905) 632-3737
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

1960 Appleby Line
Burlington Ontario
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Canada
Phone: (905) 315-8802
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sangita Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharma ( CPSO# 75188 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1234 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
1960 Appleby Line
Suite 24
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 315-8802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANGITA SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2004 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2008