Sharma, Shakti (CPSO#: 73686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: Nidumolu, Shakti (used until: 09 Jun 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Telugu

Education:Punjabi University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
7117 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 2J6
Phone: (905) 763-2526
Fax: (905) 763-8595
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit B17
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Canada
Phone: 416-222-6160 Ext. 268
Fax: 416-645-1978
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Unit 201
2250 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Canada
Phone: (905) 595-4975
Fax: (905) 595-4977
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shakti Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharma ( CPSO# 73686 )

Business Address:
201 - 7117 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 2J6
Phone Number: (905) 763-2526

Business Address:
201 - 2250 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 595-4975

Business Address:
2 Champagne Drive
Unit b17
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAKTI SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004