Sharma, Shalini (CPSO#: 94513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-5645
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shalini Sharma and Edward McNally Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharma ( CPSO# 94513 )
Dr. E. McNally ( CPSO# 96884 )

Business Address:
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHALINI SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 19 Oct 2012 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2013