Sharma, Vijay (CPSO#: 62959)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Lucknow, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 4054
Fax: (416) 281-7453
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centric Health Surgical Centre
20 Wynford Dr.
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Canada
Phone: 416-441-2111
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: (905) 946-0222
Fax: (905) 946-0225
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Crescent Oral Surgery
1940 Eglinton Avenue East
Suite 500
Toronto ON  M1L 4R1
Canada
Phone: (416) 752-5222
Fax: (416) 752-5500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Crescent Oral Surgery
9251 Younge Street
Suite 400
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9T3
Canada
Phone: (905) 889-8006
Fax: (905) 889-8866
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

GTA Endoscopy Services Inc.
Suite 902
305 Milner Avenue
Toronto ON  M1B 3V4
Canada
Phone: (416) 321-3883
Fax: (416) 321-5162
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Digestive Health Clinic
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-1700
Fax: (905) 683-2577
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Digestive Health Clinic Inc.
330 Hwy 7E
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Canada
Phone: (905) 707-5007
Fax: (905) 707-5008
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Unit 301
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 926-0262
Fax: (416) 926-0936
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vijay Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sharma ( CPSO# 62959 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
301 - 1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 926-0262

Business Address:
North Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 946-0222

Business Address:
GTA Endoscopy Services Inc
902 - 305 Milner Avenue
Toronto ON  M1B 3V4
Phone Number: (416) 321-3883

Business Address:
Digestive Health Clinic
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Phone Number: (905) 683-1700

Business Address:
Digestive Health Clinic Inc
330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIJAY SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 24 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2017

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Sep 2014
Summary:

On September 24, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Sharma committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession; 
and that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having 
regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Sharma admitted to the allegations. 
 
The College commenced an investigation into Dr. Sharma's practice in about July 2012, after it 
received information that raised concerns about Dr. Sharma's anesthesiology practice.  
 
Dr. X, the independent expert retained by the College, reviewed 26 patient charts and found that 
Dr. Sharma failed to meet the standard of practice in the following respects: 
(1)   His record-keeping fell below the standard of care in respect of eight patients. 
(2)   In respect of Patient A, although Dr. Sharma monitored this intubated patient in the 
      PACU over the course of a 31 minute period, he failed to properly hand over care to the 
      on-call anaesthesiologist prior to leaving the hospital.. 
(3)   In respect of Patient B, an elderly patient who was undergoing an urgent repair of a hip 
      fracture and was found on preliminary echo study to have moderate aortic stenosis and 
      insufficiency, Dr. Sharma administered spinal anesthesia but did not place an arterial line, 
      which would have permitted close hemodynamic monitoring.  
(4)   In respect of Patient C who was assessed as having a potentially difficult airway, Dr. 
      Sharma intubated the patient by administering a long-acting muscle relaxant 
      (rocuronium) instead of a short-acting muscle relaxant. 
(5)   In respect of Patients D and E who were undergoing cesarean sections, Dr. Sharma 
      administered 10 units of oxytocin as requested by an obstetrician, in circumstances in 
      which this dosage may have caused a drop in blood pressure. 
(6)   In respect of Patient D, Dr. Sharma administered both intrathecal and epidural opioids 
      (first administering 0.1 mg morphine during a combined spinal epidural prior to c-section 
      followed several hours later in ICU by 0.125% marcaine infusion with opioid starting at 4 
      cc/hour) in a patient having a classical cesarean section in the presence of fibroids with a 
      large midline incision and with severe hypertension, pre-eclampsia and pulmonary 
      edema.  
(7)   In respect of Patient F, an asthmatic patient with a history of duodenal ulcer and for 
      whom Dr. Sharma documented a history of GERD, Dr. Sharma used a laryngeal mask 
      airway instead of an endotracheal tube for sinus surgery. 
 
In respect of the finding of disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct: 
 
Dr. Sharma has on occasion left the operating room while his patients were undergoing 
procedures under anesthesia in a manner not in accordance with the then-current standard of 
practice in that he sometimes failed to appropriately communicate with others in the operating 
room.  
 
In June 2007, one of Dr. Sharma's colleagues called in sick and therefore was not available to 
provide anesthesia in the operating room as scheduled. Dr. Sharma was scheduled to provide 
anesthesia services in the endoscopy suite that day. Dr. Sharma proceeded to provide anesthesia 
for the operating room cases rather than the list being cancelled. Instead of giving up the cases in 
the endoscopy suite, Dr. Sharma also provided IV conscious sedation for some patients in the 
endoscopy suite.  
 
In the past, Dr. Sharma has on occasion used a computer for personal purposes in the operating 
room during surgery for which he was the attending anesthesiologist. 
 
Dr. Sharma advised, and it was confirmed by the evidence of one of the nurses interviewed by 
the College, that he no longer uses a computer for personal use in the operating room. 
 
Throughout the course of the College's investigation, Dr. Sharma showed ample promptness and 
co-operation with requests made by the College investigator, and, following receipt of Dr. X's 
reports, advised that he has incorporated positive changes into his practice in consideration of Dr. 
X's opinions.  
 
He had a positive performance appraisal in April 2014. Dr. Sharma volunteered to assume the 
role of CME co-ordinator for the department of anesthesia and arranged four grand rounds in the 
first six months of 2014. 
 
The Committee ordered and directed that: 
      the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Sharma's 
      certificate of registration:  
      (a)   Dr. Sharma shall complete, at his own expense, an educational program on 
            communications facilitated by the College within twelve (12) months from the 
            date of this Order; 
      (b)   Dr. Sharma shall, within 30 days from the date of this Order, retain a 
            College-approved clinical supervisor, who will sign an undertaking in the form 
            attached hereto as Schedule "A" (the "Clinical Supervisor"). The period of clinical 
            supervision shall last for twelve (12) months commencing on the day the Clinical 
            Supervisor is retained. Dr. Sharma will abide at his own expense by all 
            recommendations of his Clinical Supervisor with respect to practice 
            improvements and/or professional development; 
      (c)   Upon completion of this period of supervision, within six (6) months, Dr. Sharma 
            shall undergo a re-assessment of his clinical practice by a College-appointed 
            Assessor. The results of the reassessment shall be reported to the College, which 
            may use the reassessment results to ground further investigations or proceedings if 
            appropriate; and 
      (d)   Dr. Sharma shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with 
            implementing the terms of this Order. 
      Dr. Sharma attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
      Dr. Sharma shall, within thirty (30) days, pay the College its costs of this proceeding in 
      the amount of $4,460.00. 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): September 24, 2014