Sharma, Vivek Vishwanath (CPSO#: 94282)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Mumbai, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 28 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 29 Sep 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2011