Shaw, Erynn Elizabeth (CPSO#: 90929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Palliative and Supportive Care
Juravinski Cancer Center
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 64315
Fax: 905-575-6310
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E.E. Shaw Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Shaw ( CPSO# 90929 )

Business Address:
Palliative and Supportive Care
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERYNN ELIZABETH SHAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2012 to 19 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 20 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 19 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013