Shawesh, Malek Hassuna E (CPSO#: 78935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 505
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 683-1277
Fax: (905) 683-1273
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shawesh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shawesh ( CPSO# 78935 )

Business Address:
505 - 95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 683-1277

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 4S4

Business Address:
30 Coach Crescent
Whitby ON  L1R 0K8
Phone Number: (905) 425-5394

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 07 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALEK HASSUNA E SHAWESH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAWESH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 14 Apr 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 26 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 01 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2009