Shayan, Alexander Joseph (CPSO#: 80970)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2065 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7R 0B4
Phone: 905-633-8678
Fax: (905) 633-8678
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander Shayan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shayan ( CPSO# 80970 )

Business Address:
2065 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7R 0B4
Phone Number: (905) 633-7686

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER JOSEPH SHAYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006