Shaytzag, Michael Daniel (CPSO#: 95877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
Department of Psychiatry
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-845-2571 Ext. 4800
Fax: 905-845-6419
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shaytzag Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shaytzag ( CPSO# 95877 )

Business Address:
Halton Healthcare
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DANIEL SHAYTZAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAYTZAG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 22 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2017