Shcherbatykh, Ivan Yurievich (CPSO#: 88370)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Voronez State Medical Academy, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Charing Cross Medical
Unit 1-2
124 Charing Cross Street
Brantford ON  N3R 2J1
Phone: (519) 304-8550
Fax: (519) 304-8554
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ancaster Joint Clinic
81 Wilson Street West
Unit 303
Ancaster ON  L9G 1N1
Canada
Phone: (289) 239-8537
Fax: (866) 920-2702
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: (519) 751-5544
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shcherbatykh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Shcherbatykh ( CPSO# 88370 )
Dr. J. Shcherbatykh ( CPSO# 93327 )

Business Address:
81 Wilson Street West
Suite 303
Ancaster ON  L9G 1N1
Phone Number: (289) 239-8537

Business Address:
Suites 1 - 2
124 Charing Cross Street
Brantford ON  N3R 2J1
Phone Number: (519) 304-8550

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 752-7871

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IVAN YURIEVICH SHCHERBATYKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHCHERBATYKH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010