Sheasgreen, Christopher Robert Max (CPSO#: 95879)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
226-100 Arden St
Moncton NB  E1C 4B7

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 2018