Sheffield, Brandon Samuel (CPSO#: 105106)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bouvaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: 905 494 2120 Ext. 50662
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brandon Sheffield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sheffield ( CPSO# 105106)

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRANDON SAMUEL SHEFFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEFFIELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2015 to 08 Feb 2015
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2017