Sheffield, Brian (CPSO#: 24733)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 May 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Doctor's Office
9625 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5T2
Phone: (905) 508-4114
Fax: (905) 508-4116
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 May 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 13 May 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2011 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., June 20, 2011, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Brian Sheffield:


            1.    The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on
                  Dr. Sheffield's Certificate of Registration:

                  (i)   Dr. Sheffield shall not prescribe any drug that is:
                  
                        1.    Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                  
                        2.    Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        3.    Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under
                              the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); or
                  
                        4.    Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19).
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached [to the
                        Order] as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are
                        attached [to the Order] as Schedule "B")
                  
                  (ii)  Dr. Sheffield shall post a sign that is clearly visible upon
                        entering his office(s) in the form set out at Schedule "C" [to the
                        Order].  For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows:
                        "Dr. Sheffield is prohibited from prescribing Narcotic Drugs,
                        Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                        Targeted Substances"; and
                  
                  (iii) Dr. Sheffield shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his
                        practice and patient charts and such other steps as the College may
                        take for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance
                        with the terms of the Order.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Jun 2011
Summary:

On June 20, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Brian Sheffield has committed an act 
of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession. 
 
Consistent and concerning patterns were discovered in Dr. Sheffield's assessment, diagnosis, 
treatment and follow-up care of patients, particularly with respect to his prescribing habits. Dr. 
Sheffield prescribed extremely excessive amounts of opioid medications, did not seem to pick up 
drug seeking behaviour, and was not making use of recommendations from pain specialists. For 
many of the patients reviewed by the College, they came seeking relief for pain and in the 
process developed a serious drug dependency. In May 2010, Dr. Sheffield successfully completed 
the College's prescribing course. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Sheffield's 
      Certificate of Registration: 
 
      (a)   Dr. Sheffield shall not prescribe any drug that is: 
 
            (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the 
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
 
            (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under 
                  the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
 
            (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and 
                  Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); or 
 
            (iv)  Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines 
                  and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled 
                  Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19) 
 
      (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of 
      Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached [to the Order] as Schedule "A"; and the 
      current regulatory lists are attached [to the Order] as Schedule "B") 
 
      (b)   Dr. Sheffield shall post a sign that is clearly visible upon entering his office(s) in 
            the form set out at Schedule "C" [to the Order].  For further clarity, this sign shall 
            state as follows:  "Dr. Sheffield is prohibited from prescribing Narcotic Drugs, 
            Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted 
            Substances"; and 
 
      (c)   Dr. Sheffield shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and 
            patient charts and such other steps as the College may take for the purpose of 
            monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of the Order. 
 
 
 
 
2.    Dr. Sheffield pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within thirty (30) days 
      from the date of this Order. 
 
3.    Dr. Sheffield appear before it to be reprimanded. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): June 20, 2011