Shefrin, Allan Evan (CPSO#: 89865)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Eastern Ontario
Div of Paediatric Emergency Med
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allan Shefrin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shefrin ( CPSO# 89865 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Paediatric Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN EVAN SHEFRIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEFRIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2008 to 10 Oct 2008
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 19 Oct 2009 to 15 Nov 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010