Shehata, Fady Fouad Amin (CPSO#: 95629)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8937
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FADY FOUAD AMIN SHEHATA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEHATA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Oct 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 12 Mar 2013 to 03 Jun 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 19 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018