Shehata, Ramez Samir Hanna (CPSO#: 77210)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 May 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17B-350 CONESTOGA BLV
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: 18886233810
Fax: 5196231760
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
cambridge, ON
Canada
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
Phone: 5196212333 Ext. 2100
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Apr 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 14 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 15 Sep 2003 to 15 Mar 2004
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 16 Mar 2004 to 30 Apr 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2009 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Ramez   Samir  Hanna  Shehata  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            Anaesthesia, only.