Sheik-Yousouf, Mohammad Amir (CPSO#: 89434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Urdu

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6990 Derry Road, Suite 102
Milton ON  L9T 7H3
Canada
Phone: (905) 878-8888
Fax: (905) 878-9322
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD AMIR SHEIK-YOUSOUF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEIK-YOUSOUF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2013