Sheikh, Adeel Ali (CPSO#: 89112)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Urology
Suite 304
379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone: (905) 472-7120
Fax: (905) 472-2971
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adeel Sheikh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sheikh ( CPSO# 89112 )

Business Address:
Suite 304
379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADEEL ALI SHEIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEIKH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013