Sheikh, Farrukh Batool (CPSO#: 50005)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheikh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2018

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients who saw Dr. Sheikh at 1105 Kingston Road can sent a letter to 1105 Kingston Road, Pickering, ON L1V 1B5 to request a copy of their files.
Date Received: 03 Nov 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018