Sheikh, Hasan Munir (CPSO#: 97717)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Toronto General Hospital
R. Fraser Elliott Building
Rm 480, 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: (416) 340-4300
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H.M. Sheikh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sheikh ( CPSO# 97717 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
R. Fraser Elliot Building - Room 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HASAN MUNIR SHEIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEIKH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2015