Sheldrick, Melissa Lynn (CPSO#: 95161)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greenbelt Family Health Team
3500 Fallowfield Road
Nepean, ON
Ottawa ON  K2J 4A7
Phone: (613) 843-1718
Fax: (613) 843-0201
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA LYNN SHELDRICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHELDRICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2013