Shen, Xiou Seeger (CPSO#: 90433)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Cardiology Associates
Unit 307
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone: (705) 735-1111
Fax: (705) 735-1888
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Victoria Regional Health Ctr
Division of Cardiology
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 46215
Fax: (705) 739-5698
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. X. S. Shen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. X. Shen ( CPSO# 90433 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Division of Cardiology
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Business Address:
125 Bell Farm Road
Suite 307
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone Number: (705) 735-1111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. XIOU SEEGER SHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2009 to 28 Jun 2009
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

McMaster University, 29 Jun 2009 to 19 Jul 2009
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014