Sheppard, Matthew Jacob (CPSO#: 95452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Department of Anesthesia
123 Edward Street
12th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-978-6710
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW JACOB SHEPPARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEPPARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pain Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 15 Oct 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pain Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Oct 2018 to 21 Oct 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pain Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016