Sheridan, Kaitlin Marie (CPSO#: 109930)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
935 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON  P3E 2C6
Phone: 705-675-4883
Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAITLIN MARIE SHERIDAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHERIDAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2018