Sherif, Hesham A (CPSO#: 75177)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Sevices
Department of Ophthalmology
Suite 7213
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Fax: (519) 376-7160
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hesham Sherif Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sherif ( CPSO# 75177 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Ophthalmology
Suite 7213
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2777

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Libya

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HESHAM A SHERIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHERIF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007