Sherman, Maliha Ali Hass (CPSO#: 81376)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Swahili

Education:University of Karachi, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Centennial Parkway South
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2C5
Phone: (905) 662-2231
Fax: (905) 662-2233
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maliha Sherman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sherman ( CPSO# 81376 )

Business Address:
60 Centennial Parkway South
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2C5
Phone Number: (905) 662-2231

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALIHA ALI HASS SHERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHERMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2007