Sheth, Tarang Narendra (CPSO#: 72338)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Mississauga Hospital Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp.
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville, Ontario
L6M0L8
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Magnuson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 17 2017


Corporation Name: Tarang Sheth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sheth ( CPSO# 72338 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARANG NARENDRA SHETH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003