Sheth, Tej Narendra (CPSO#: 72561)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site - DVBSR1 Building
237 Barton Street
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 577-1423
Fax: (905) 577-1474
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 46558
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tej N. Sheth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sheth ( CPSO# 72561 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 577-1423

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 30 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TEJ NARENDRA SHETH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002