Shetty, Rathnakar Bellampalli (CPSO#: 68408)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Mar 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Tulu

Education:Mysore University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health
St Catharines Hospital
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shetty & Shetty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Shetty ( CPSO# 68553 )
Dr. R. Shetty ( CPSO# 68408 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health St. Catherines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 684-7271

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. 13 - 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 30 Oct 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RATHNAKAR BELLAMPALLI SHETTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETTY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1997