Shi, Dawn Donghui (CPSO#: 81478)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Shi, Dong Hui (used until: 08 Mar 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Shanghai Second Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waterdrop Medical & Cosmetic Centre
20 Norton Ave
North York ON  M2N 0C6
Phone: (416) 901-5736
Fax: (416) 901-5768
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dawn Shi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Shi ( CPSO# 81478 )

Business Address:
20 Norton Avenue
North York ON  M2N 0C6
Phone Number: (416) 901-5786

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Aug 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAWN DONGHUI SHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2007

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: August 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On August 15, 2018, the Quality Assurance Committee (“QAC”) required family medicine physician, Dr. Dawn Donghui Shi, to complete a specified continuing education and remediation program (“SCERP”). The SCERP requires Dr. Shi to:

• Attend and provide proof of successful completion of the following course:
o University of Toronto Medical Records Course
o Foundation for Medical Education SGPB Program (or equivalent)
o Saegis – Practice Management Services
o OMA – Managing your practice

• Practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months;

• Review the following policies, guidelines or tools with reference to how each is applicable to family medicine:
o Ontario Prenatal Record for gravid patients in their 1st trimester
o CPSO Medical records Policy
o Template resources
?Diabeties Patient Care Flow Sheet
?PHQ-9
?Rourke Baby Record
? Greig Health Record

• Undergo a reassessment with an assessor selected by the College, approximately 12 months following the completion of the Education Plan.