Shiau, Judy Yi-Nan (CPSO#: 70057)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LEAF Weight Management Clinic
118- 1980 Ogilvie Road
Ottawa, ON
K1J 9L3
Ottawa ON  K1J 9L3
Phone: (613) 701-1222
Fax: (613) 701-1223
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Maurice Grimes Lodge 3rd floor
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y4E9
Canada
Phone: 613-761-5101
Fax: 613-761-5343
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derek So Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. So ( CPSO# 71596 )
Dr. J. Shiau ( CPSO# 70057 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa- Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Suite H3408
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7332

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDY YI-NAN SHIAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000