Shichor, Tal Miriam (CPSO#: 80069)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Jan 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The Hebrew University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Anaesthesia
PO Box 2000 HSC 2U1
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75166
Fax: (905) 523-1224
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 16 Jan 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2003 to 27 Oct 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 28 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Oct 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Tal Miriam Shichor may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anaesthesia, McMaster University, in which Dr. Shichor holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Shichor
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.