Shiffman, Howard Neil (CPSO#: 78936)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
520 Ellesmere Rd
Suite 301
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: (416)615-0000
Fax: (416) 615-2200
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Howard Shiffman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Shiffman ( CPSO# 78936 )

Business Address:
301 - 520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 615-0000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD NEIL SHIFFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIFFMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Apr 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Apr 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jun 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jan 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2004