Shiffman, Norman Jack (CPSO#: 27440)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N J Shiffman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Shiffman ( CPSO# 27440 )

Business Address:
2533 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1L1
Phone Number: (416) 698-5521

Medical Records Location

Address: P- 416-841-2158
Instructions: Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of their record should contact the number above.
Date Received: 03 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 26 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORMAN JACK SHIFFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIFFMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1975